NM SB75 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-14 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-14 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Agency Disclosure Of Sensitive Info
Title
State Agency Disclosure Of Sensitive Info
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-14 | Senate | Pocket Veto |
2021-03-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:45 N:18 |
2021-03-10 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-03 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:6 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2021-02-24 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-02-01 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SJC |