NM SB7 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Driver's License Suspension Penalties
Title
Driver's License Suspension Penalties
Sponsors
Rep. Daymon Ely [D] | Sen. Peter Wirth [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-05 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:6 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC |