NM SB668 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 86 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 86 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare - State Ethics Commission Act
Title
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 86 - Mar. 28 |
2019-03-16 | Senate | Senate has concurred with House Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:0 |
2019-03-15 | House | multiple floor amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-13 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | fl/aaaaaaa |
2019-03-13 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to: SJC |
2019-03-11 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but without recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Not Printed |