NM SB621 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Passed House (67-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.220.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Passed House (67-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.220.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Public peace, health, safety & welfare
Title
Public peace, health, safety & welfare
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Passed House (67-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.220. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Energy & Natural Resources |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Assigned to House Energy & Natural Resources and then to House Judiciary |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Assigned to Senate Conservation |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Committee substitute and then to WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Not Printed |