NM SB58 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] s/cncrd POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] s/cncrd POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Livestock product manufacturer registration
Title
Livestock product manufacturer registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] s/cncrd POCKET VETO. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP/a - PASSED/H (57-7) | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] DP-HTRC | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] HAGC/HTRC-HAGC | |
2011-02-11 | [LD 25] PASSED/S (33-0) | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] DP | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] DP-SFC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SCONC/SFC-SCONC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SPREF |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=58&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0058.pdf |