NM SB57 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-02 - [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-02 - [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School District Personnel Minimum Salaries
Title
School District Personnel Minimum Salaries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Senate | [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely |
2018-02-02 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-02 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-29 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Education |
2018-01-29 | Senate | [LD 8] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-17 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=57&year=18 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/18%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0057.pdf |