NM SB555 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 53] Passed House (67-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.149.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 53] Passed House (67-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.149.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State-owned railroad property disposal
Title
State-owned railroad property disposal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 53] Passed House (67-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.149. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (32-2) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | [LD 38] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |