NM SB50 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 200 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 200 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Right To Repair Act
Title
Right To Repair Act
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 200 - Apr. 6 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Senate has concurred with House Amendments |
2023-03-17 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:46 N:15 |
2023-03-17 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2023-03-16 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-03-10 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:31 N:0 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2023-02-08 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SJC |