NM SB496 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] HHGAC- DP - PASSED/H (63-0) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] HHGAC- DP - PASSED/H (63-0) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Water utility payments in advance
Title
Water utility payments in advance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HHGAC- DP - PASSED/H (63-0) POCKET VETO. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] PASSED/S (36-0) | |
2011-02-16 | [LD 30] DP | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] DNP-CS/DP-SPAC | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] SCONC/SPAC-SCONC |