NM SB476 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] s/cncrd SGND (Apr. 6) Ch. 91.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] s/cncrd SGND (Apr. 6) Ch. 91.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
No college credits needed for state police
Title
No college credits needed for state police
Sponsors
Sen. Phil Griego [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] s/cncrd SGND (Apr. 6) Ch. 91. | |
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] PASSED/H (65-0) | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] w/drn-HJC- DP/a | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] HEC/HJC-HEC | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] PASSED/S (27-14) | |
2011-02-16 | [LD 30] DP | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] SPAC | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] DP-SPAC | |
2011-01-29 | [LD 12] SEC/SPAC-SEC |