NM SB464 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agritourism Promotion Act
Title
Agritourism Promotion Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2023-03-17 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:59 N:0 |
2023-03-14 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-03-10 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-03-03 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SJC |