NM SB43 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 8] Passed House (67-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 8] Passed House (67-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wastewater System Financing
Title
Wastewater System Financing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (67-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2018-02-10 | House | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-07 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2018-02-07 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2018-02-02 | Senate | [LD 11] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-18 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2018-01-18 | Senate | [LD 3] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-17 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Finance |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |