NM SB429 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 53] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 53] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic violence & missing persons
Title
Domestic violence & missing persons
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 53] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 53] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (32-0) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |