NM SB421 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 53] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 53] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Times for firefighter service credit changes
Title
Times for firefighter service credit changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 53] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 53] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (30-0) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Assigned to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |