NM SB417 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] s/cncrd SGND (Mar.31) Ch. 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] s/cncrd SGND (Mar.31) Ch. 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Native american suicide prevention
Title
Native american suicide prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] s/cncrd SGND (Mar.31) Ch. 15. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] PASSED/H (64-0) | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP/a-HAFC- w/drn | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] HHGAC/HAFC-HHGAC | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DP/a - PASSED/S (37-0) | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] DP-SFC | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] SIAC/SFC-SIAC |