NM SB408 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] DP - PASSED/H (38-28) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.185.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] DP - PASSED/H (38-28) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.185.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create interim redistricting committee
Title
Create interim redistricting committee
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] DP - PASSED/H (38-28) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.185. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HAFC | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] fl/a- PASSED/S (39-0) | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DP | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DP-SJC | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] SRC/SJC-SRC |