NM SB40 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State School Grades Council
Title
State School Grades Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Education |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Education |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Passed Senate (23-15) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Rules |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Education |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Rules and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |