NM SB40 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Mar.28) Ch. 55.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Mar.28) Ch. 55.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
No electronic communications in jails
Title
No electronic communications in jails
Sponsors
Sen. Sander Rue [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Signed by one or both houses (Mar.28) Ch. 55. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Passed House (67-1) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-12 | House | [LD 21] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2013-02-12 | House | [LD 21] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Passed Senate (34-3) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Floor amendment adopted |
2013-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |