NM SB40 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (45-24) VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (45-24) VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Livestock crime stoppers act
Title
Livestock crime stoppers act
Sponsors
Sen. Phil Griego [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (45-24) VETO. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] HJC | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DP - PASSED/S (38-2) | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] DP/a-SFC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] DP-SJC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SCONC/SJC/SFC-SCONC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SPREF |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=40&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0040.pdf |