NM SB4 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (58-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 67.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (58-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 67.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Volunteer firefighter retirement svc. credit
Title
Volunteer firefighter retirement svc. credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (58-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 67. |
2015-03-20 | House | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] HWMC |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Assigned to House Judiciary and then to HWMC |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-23 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-01-23 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |