NM SB39 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 6 - Feb. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 6 - Feb. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Procurement Preferences Changes
Title
Procurement Preferences Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 6 - Feb. 28 |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2022-02-14 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-11 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-08 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HCEDC |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:0 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Floor substitute adopted |
2022-02-05 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | SIRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-01-20 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SIRC/STBTC |