NM SB378 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Coverage for prescription eye drop refills
Title
Coverage for prescription eye drop refills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP API. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DP-HBIC | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] HHGAC/HBIC-HHGAC | |
2011-02-11 | [LD 25] DP - fl/a- PASSED/S (34-0) | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] DP/a-SCORC | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] SPAC/SCORC-SPAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=378&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0378.pdf |