NM SB366 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Combine prescription drug refills
Title
Combine prescription drug refills
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-01 | House | [LD 34] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2013-03-01 | House | [LD 34] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Judiciary |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Passed Senate (35-0) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |