NM SB354 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (64-0) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (64-0) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substance abuse and pregnant women services
Title
Substance abuse and pregnant women services
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (64-0) POCKET VETO. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] HHGAC | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] PASSED/S (34-0) | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DP | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] DP-SCORC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SPAC/SCORC-SPAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=354&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0354.pdf |