NM SB349 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (68-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.132.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (68-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.132.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow donations from private sources
Title
Allow donations from private sources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (68-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.132. | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] HJC | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] PASSED/S (36-0) | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] DP | |
2011-02-06 | [LD 20] DP-SEC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SPAC/SEC-SPAC |