NM SB341 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Leg. Approp For Comm Schools Fund
Title
Leg. Approp For Comm Schools Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2021-03-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0 |
2021-03-12 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-08 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-04 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-24 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC |