NM SB341 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 19 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - [LD 43] Passed House (59-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 6) Ch. 47.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 19 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - [LD 43] Passed House (59-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 6) Ch. 47.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Use of nurse educators fund for degree
Title
Use of nurse educators fund for degree
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Campos [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | [LD 43] Passed House (59-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 6) Ch. 47. |
2015-03-18 | House | [LD 42] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Education |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-04 | House | [LD 32] HHC |
2015-03-04 | House | [LD 32] HHC and then to House Education |
2015-02-27 | Senate | [LD 29] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | [LD 29] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Education |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |