NM SB34 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Failed passage in Senate (21-22).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Failed passage in Senate (21-22).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
No standards-based tests factored into gpa
Title
No standards-based tests factored into gpa
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 21 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Failed passage in Senate (21-22). |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Education |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Education and then to Senate Judiciary |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |