NM SB334 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC
Pending: House Appropriations & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC
Pending: House Appropriations & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Black Fire Recovery
Title
Black Fire Recovery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-16 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SFC |