NM SB33 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] w/drn-HJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] w/drn-HJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance fraud penalties
Title
Insurance fraud penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] w/drn-HJC API. | |
2011-02-14 | [LD 28] HBIC/HJC-HBIC | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] PASSED/S (36-2) | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] DP | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] DNP-CS/DP-SJC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SCORC/SJC-SCORC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SPREF |