NM SB318 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Include E-cigarettes In Clean Indoor Air Act
Title
Include E-cigarettes In Clean Indoor Air Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (50-12) |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] HHouse Health |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] HHouse Health and then to House Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | [LD 24] Passed Senate (30-10) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-01 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | Senate | [LD 16] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-01 | Senate | [LD 16] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |