NM SB317 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 136 - Apr. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 136 - Apr. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
No Behavioral Health Cost Sharing
Title
No Behavioral Health Cost Sharing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 136 - Apr. 8 |
2021-03-20 | Senate | Senate has concurred with House Amendments |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:43 N:26 |
2021-03-19 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2021-03-17 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-15 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:25 N:12 |
2021-03-14 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-09 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SFC |