NM SB313 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 7 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - [LD 14] Passed House (58-8) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 11) Ch. 63 (partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 7 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - [LD 14] Passed House (58-8) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 11) Ch. 63 (partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
General appropriations act of 2014
Title
General appropriations act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. John Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Passed House (58-8) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 11) Ch. 63 (partial veto). |
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (42-0) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Floor amendment adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Finance |