NM SB303 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 78 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 78 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Change Ed Retirement Board Membership
Title
Change Ed Retirement Board Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 78 - Apr. 6 |
2021-03-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:43 N:26 |
2021-03-11 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-09 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:23 N:18 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-17 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee without a recommendation |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SHPAC |