NM SB302 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] PASSED/H (61-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.147.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] PASSED/H (61-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.147.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Registration plate for disabled veterans
Title
Registration plate for disabled veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] PASSED/H (61-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.147. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DP | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] HTPWC | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] PASSED/S (38-0) | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] DP | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] DP-SJC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SCORC/SJC-SCORC |