NM SB299 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 19 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - [LD 43] Passed House (65-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.116.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 19 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - [LD 43] Passed House (65-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.116.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nurse practitioner scope of practice
Title
Nurse practitioner scope of practice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | [LD 43] Passed House (65-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.116. |
2015-03-16 | House | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] HHC |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Passed Senate (35-3) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |