NM SB297 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - HRDLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: House Appropriations & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - HRDLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: House Appropriations & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mlk Commission Funding
Title
Mlk Commission Funding
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | HRDLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-28 | House | Sent to HRDLC - Referrals: HRDLC/HAFC |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0 |
2023-02-25 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-16 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SFC |