NM SB289 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-19 - [LD 26] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-19 - [LD 26] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal water projects gross receipts
Title
Federal water projects gross receipts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-19 | [LD 26] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-19 | [LD 26] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue | |
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-10 | [LD 19] Referred to House Business & Industry | |
2012-02-10 | [LD 19] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Taxation & Revenue | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Passed Senate (34-0) | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Floor amendment adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-01-25 | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation | |
2012-01-25 | [LD 7] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=289&year=12 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/12%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0289.pdf |