NM SB285 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Passed House (57-4) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Passed House (57-4) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Race Day Requirements Change
Title
Race Day Requirements Change
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Papen [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (57-4) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Assigned to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife and then to House Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | [LD 24] Passed Senate (36-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |