NM SB279 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] PASSED/H (37-29) SGND (Mar.1) Ch.10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] PASSED/H (37-29) SGND (Mar.1) Ch.10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public peace, health, safety & welfare
Title
Public peace, health, safety & welfare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | [LD 24] PASSED/H (37-29) SGND (Mar.1) Ch.10. | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] HTRC- DP | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] fl/a- PASSED/S (34-2) | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] DNP-CS/w/o rec | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] DNP-CS/DP-SCC-germane-SFC | |
2010-01-25 | [LD 5] not prntd-SPAC/SCC-SPAC |