NM SB276 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC
Pending: House Local Government, Land Grants & Cultural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Regional Hazmat Response Volunteer Teams

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional Hazmat Response Volunteer Teams

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseSent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC
2021-03-10SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:29 N:6
2021-03-08SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-02-17SenateSCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-02-01SenateSent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SJC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback