NM SB272 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 76 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 76 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Military Family Early School Enrollment
Title
Military Family Early School Enrollment
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Pope [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 76 - Apr. 6 |
2021-03-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:70 N:0 |
2021-03-11 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-08 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-03 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HLVMC |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-17 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SHPAC |