NM SB271 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (57-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (57-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Out-of-state event gross receipts
Title
Out-of-state event gross receipts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (57-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] HWMC |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] HBEC |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] HBEC and then to HWMC |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |