NM SB268 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 7 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - [LD 14] Passed House (55-10) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 12) Ch. 79 (partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Sole community provider federal compliance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sole community provider federal compliance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-19 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-07House[LD 14] Passed House (55-10) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 12) Ch. 79 (partial veto).
2014-02-06House[LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted
2014-02-06House[LD 13] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue
2014-02-04Senate[LD 11] Passed Senate (38-4)
2014-02-04Senate[LD 11] Floor amendment adopteda
2014-02-04Senate[LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2014-02-04Senate[LD 11] Referred to Senate Finance
2014-02-04Senate[LD 11] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2014-02-04Senate[LD 11] Do not pass committee report adopted
2014-01-27Senate[LD 5] Referred to Senate Public Affairs
2014-01-27Senate[LD 5] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session
2014-01-24Senate[LD 4] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee
2014-01-24Senate[LD 4] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback