NM SB265 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

County Jurisdiction Over Traffic Citations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Jurisdiction Over Traffic Citations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseSent to HJC - Referrals: HJC
2021-03-09SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0
2021-03-08SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-03-02SenateSHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-02-01SenateSent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SJC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback