NM SB262 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative Public Works Committee
Title
Legislative Public Works Committee
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Cervantes [D] | Sen. Carlos Cisneros [D] | Rep. Kelly Fajardo [R] | Sen. John Sapien [D] |
Sen. Bill Tallman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Passed Senate (29-10) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Rules |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Finance |