NM SB250 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (44-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.156.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (44-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.156.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Surplus lines insurance multistate compact
Title
Surplus lines insurance multistate compact
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (44-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.156. | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] HBIC/HJC-HBIC | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] PASSED/S (36-0) | |
2011-02-11 | [LD 25] DP | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] DNP-CS/DP-SJC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SCORC/SJC-SCORC |