NM SB247 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-04 - HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-04 - HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Licensing Act Changes
Title
Uniform Licensing Act Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-04 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-25 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HJC |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2023-02-21 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2023-02-09 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SJC |