NM SB241 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Passed House (61-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Passed House (61-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School Visual Arts & Physical Ed Standards
Title
School Visual Arts & Physical Ed Standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (61-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Education |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Education |
2017-02-05 | Senate | [LD 20] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Education |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Public Affairs |