NM SB238 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require Bond To Protect Property Owner
Title
Require Bond To Protect Property Owner
Sponsors
Sen. James White [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-14 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:30 N:1 |
2019-03-02 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-14 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |